House | 05/02/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Bashore |