House
|
05/02/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Stinson
|
|
|