Senate | 04/11/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Grego | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 7 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Phillips | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Newton |