House
|
04/28/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Boatman
|
|
|