Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3879 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/20/2022

                            RBH No. 9364 
 
Req. No. 9364 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
HOUSE BILL 3879 	By: Crosswhite Hader 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to public retirement systems; 
amending 20 O.S. 2021, Section 1102, which relates to 
The Uniform Retirement System for Justices and 
Judges; requiring certain Justices to retire in 
certain circumstances ; and providing an effective 
date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     20 O.S. 2021, Secti on 1102, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 1102. A.  Any Justice or Judge of the Supreme Court, 
Court of Criminal Appeals, Workers ' Compensation Court, Court of 
Appeals or District Court who serves as Just ice or judge of any of 
said courts in the Sta te of Oklahoma shall be a member of The 
Uniform Retirement System for Justices and Judges .  For members 
whose initial service as a member of the System began prior to 
January 1, 2012, such member who serves for a period of eight (8) 
years or longer and upo n reaching or passing the age of sixty -five 
(65) years, or who serves for a period of ten (10) years or longer 
and upon reaching or passing the age of sixty (60) years , or whose  RBH No. 9364 
 
Req. No. 9364 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
sum of years of service and age e qual or exceeds eighty (80), after 
completing eight (8) years of judicial service, shall be eligible to 
receive the retirement benefits herein provided.  For members whose 
initial service as a member of the Syste m began on or after January 
1, 2012, such member who serves for a period of eight (8) yea rs or 
longer and upon reaching or passing the age of sixty -seven (67) 
years or who serves for a period of ten (10) years or longer and 
upon reaching or passing the age of sixty-two (62) years shall be 
eligible to receive the retirement benefits herein prov ided.  In 
determining the periods of time above mentioned a major fraction of 
a year shall count as a whole year.  If such Justice or judge is 
still serving in such ca pacity when the above requirements are 
complied with, the Justice or judge may elect to r etire and may 
elect whether such retirement shall become effective immediately or 
at a specified time within the term of the Justice or judge or at 
the expiration of the term of the Justice or judge.  The Justic e or 
judge shall file a written declaration w ith the System and the Court 
Administrator of his or her desire to retire.  The Court 
Administrator shall notify the Governor within five (5) business 
days of receiving the Notice of Retirement. 
B.  Upon filing of an election by any Justice or judge to ret ire 
as authorized by Section 1101 et seq. of this title, the office held 
by such Justice or judge shall become vacated immediately or at the 
specified time within the term of the Justice or judge, or at the  RBH No. 9364 
 
Req. No. 9364 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
expiration of the term of the Justice or judge in accordance with 
the election of the Justice or judge desiring retirement status.  
Any such vacancy so created shall be filled in the manner provided 
by law and the Constitution. 
C. If any retired member of the System should be elected or 
appointed to any judicial or other office covered by the System, the 
retirement compensation of the retired member shall be suspended 
during the period of time that the retired member holds such office 
and be reinstated upon le aving such office.  Notwithstanding any 
other provision of this section or any other provision of law to the 
contrary, a retired Justice or judge shall be permitted to be 
employed by any college or university wit hin The Oklahoma State 
System of Higher Educ ation as a full-time or part-time member of the 
faculty or as a teacher in any common school or career and 
technology education entity without suspension of retirement 
benefits. 
D.  Any participating employer who is employing such a retiree 
as described in subsection C of this section shall make prop er 
written notification to the System informing it of the beginning 
date of such retiree 's employment.  Any retiree returning to work 
for a participating employer shal l make contributions to the System 
and the employer shall do likewise.  All retirees who have returned 
to employment and participation in the System following retirement  RBH No. 9364 
 
Req. No. 9364 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
shall have post-retirement benefits calculated on one of the 
following methods: 
1.  All service accumulated from date of reemploym ent shall be 
computed based on the benefit fo rmula applicable at that time, and 
the additional benefits shall be added to the previous benefits.  
Such additional benefits shall be calculated each year based upon 
additional service accrued from July 1 to Ju ne 30 of the previous 
year and the additional benefits, if any, will be added to the 
retiree's monthly benefit beginning January 1 of the year after the 
retiree terminates the post -retirement employment and begin s to 
receive a benefit.  However, the post -retirement service credit 
shall be cumulative, beginning with service credit accrued after the 
date of retirement, provided that the retiree has not received a 
distribution of the post -retirement contributions.  A ll post-
retirement additional benefits shall be calculated using actual 
hours worked as well as the actual compensation received and upon 
which contributions are paid.  Post -retirement service is not 
subject to the partial year round -up provisions of subse ction A of 
this section, and only full years of service will result in an 
increase in a retiree's benefit. 
2.  Any retiree who returns to employment with a participating 
employer for a minimum period of thirty -six (36) consecutive months, 
shall have all service accumulated from date of reemployment counted 
as participating service.  For purpos es of determining the  RBH No. 9364 
 
Req. No. 9364 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
retirement benefits of such a member upon the termination of such 
reemployment, all creditable service of the member shall be computed 
based on the benefit formula applicable at the time of termination 
of such reemployment.  A retiree who is not reemployed for the full 
thirty-six (36) consecutive months shall upon termination of such 
reemployment have only the additional amount added to his or her 
benefit. 
3.  The provisions of this section shall not be applicable to 
Section 1104B of this title. 
E.  Any Justice of the Oklahoma Supreme Court whose first 
participating service in The Uniform Retirement System for Justices 
and Judges occurs on or after November 1, 2022, shall retire from 
The Uniform Retirement System for Justices and Judges not later than 
the last day of the m onth in which the Justice attains the age of 
seventy-five (75) years. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2022. 
 
58-2-9364 CMA 01/17/22  
 
THOMAS E. CUMMINS  CONSULTING ACTUARY, INC. 
2512 E. 71
st  
Street ,  Suite D ∙  Tulsa, Oklahoma 74136                             (918) 492-9658  ∙ (918) 492- 9659 
 
 
 
 
January 18, 2022 
 
 
 
Representative Crosswhite Hader 
Room 3322 
 
 
Re: RBH No. 9364 
 
 
RBH No. 9364 would require Supreme Court Justices wh o first serve in 
the URSJJ after 11/1/2022 to retire at age 75.  
 
This bill is a fiscal bill under OPLAAA. The longer a participant 
remains as an active participant and not in pay status the lower the 
liability to the system. 
 
I am a member of the American Academy of Actuaries and meet the 
Qualification Standards of the American Academy of Actuaries to 
render the actuarial opinion herein. 
 
 
Thomas E. Cummins 
 
Thomas E. Cummins, MAAA