Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Energy | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative McCall |