Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 22 | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Authored by Senator Boren (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Bell |