House
|
05/02/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Remove Representative Burns as principal House author and substitute with Representative Culver
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Burns
|
|
|