House
|
05/09/2022
|
Vetoed 05/06/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|