House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Bush
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Standridge, Bergstrom, Merrick, Allen, Burns, Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Frix
|
|
|