House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Burns
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Smith, Boles, Humphrey
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|