House
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Boatman
|
|
|