Senate | 04/05/2022 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) West (Josh) | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 18 | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Roe, CrosswhiteHader, Bashore, Kendrix, Dills, Stearman, Roberts (Sean), West (Kevin), Steagall, Patzkowsky, Boles, West (Josh), Wolfley | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Hasenbeck |