House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Quinn, Montgomery, Garvin, Stanley, Jett, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Sneed
|
|
|