Senate | 04/11/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Davis, McDugle | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Remove Representative Davis as principal House author and substitute with Representative Marti | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Davis |