Senate | 04/12/2022 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative McCall |