Senate | 04/12/2022 | Failed in Committee - Finance | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 17 | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Frix, Ford, McCall | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Remove Representative Hill as principal House author and substitute with Representative Boatman | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Hill |