House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Hill
|
|
|