House
|
05/11/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Eric)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Ford
|
|
|