Senate | 04/25/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Dahm | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Remove Representative Baker as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hilbert | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Baker |