Senate | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Davis | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kendrix | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick) |