House | 03/14/2022 | Approved by Governor 03/14/2022 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | JCR adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Direct to Calendar | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | General Order | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez |