Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4470 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 05/18/2022

                     
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 4470 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 4470 	By: Wallace, Martinez, and 
Fugate of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Department of Public Safety; 
requiring that certain funds be utilized for certain 
purposes; providing budgeting and expenditure 
limitations and procedures; providing for lapse of 
funds under certain conditions ; requiring and 
prohibiting certain budget procedures; and providing 
for noncodification. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
From the funds appropriated to the Department of Public Safety 
in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th 
Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of Pub lic Safety is hereby 
authorized to expend Fourteen Million Two Hundred Thirty-one 
Thousand Dollars ($14,231,000.00) to provide a pay increase to 
commissioned law enforcement officers of the Oklahoma Highway 
Patrol.   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 4470 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
From the funds appropriated to the Department of Public Safety 
in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2 nd Session of the 58th 
Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of Pub lic Safety is hereby 
authorized to expend Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($500,000 .00) to 
provide a pay increase to persons serving as Communications 
Dispatchers for the Department of Public Safety. 
SECTION 3.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
From the funds approp riated to the Department of Public Safety 
in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th 
Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of Public Safety is hereby 
authorized to expend One Hundred Sixty-four Thousand Dollars 
($164,000.00) to provide a pay increase to persons providing 
security services at the Oklahoma Capitol building. 
SECTION 4.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
From the funds appropriated to the Depart ment of Public Safety 
in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th 
Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of Pub lic Safety is hereby 
authorized to expend One Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars 
($150,000.00) to create and maintain the Mental Wel lness Division as   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 4470 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
described in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 1613 of the 2nd Session of the 
58th Oklahoma Legislature. 
SECTION 5.  Appropriations made by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital o utlay purposes, may be budgeted fo r 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY-23) or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024 (hereafter FY-24).  
Funds budgeted for FY-23 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2023, and must by exp ended by November 15, 2023.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2023, and not budgeted for FY-24, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY-24 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2024.  Any funds remaining after November 15, 2024, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then cu rrent fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted i n both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -23, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fisc al year, may be budgeted for FY-24, after 
the agency to which the funds have been app ropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program r evision removing these funds 
from the FY-23 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 4470 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
 
Passed the House of Representatives the 18th day of May, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the H ouse 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate