Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Coauthored by all other Representatives | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/16/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/16/2021 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Fugate |