Senate | 04/11/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Eric) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, McDugle, Grego, Stark, Wolfley | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Manger, Townley |