Senate | 04/13/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Lepak |