Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021