Senate | 05/10/2021 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2021 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Energy | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator David |