House | 04/19/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Boren | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Treat |