Senate | 05/24/2021 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2021 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | JCR adopted | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Hall | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Authored by Senator Thompson |