House | 04/05/2022 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |