Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022