Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1152 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 30, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022