Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Taylor
|
|
|