House | 04/18/2022 | Remove Representative Roberts (Dustin) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Humphrey | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Bullard |