Senate | 04/25/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Garvin |