House | 04/18/2022 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Quinn |