Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1253 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022