House | 04/13/2022 | Emergency added | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Garvin |