ENGR. S. B. NO. 1262 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ENGROSSED SENATE BILL NO. 1262 By: Coleman of the Senate and Townley of the House [ sales tax code - limit on certain apportionment - effective date ] BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOM A: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 68 O.S. 20 21, Section 1353, is amended to read as follows: Section 1353. A. It is hereby declared to be the purpose of the Oklahoma Sales Tax Code to provide funds for the financing o f the program provided for by the Oklahoma Social Security Act and to provide revenues for the support of the functions of the state government of Oklahoma, and for this purp ose it is hereby expressly provided that, revenues derived pursuant to the provisi ons of the Oklahoma Sales Tax Code, subjec t to the apportionment requirements for the Oklahoma Tax Commission and Office of Management and Enterprise Services Joint Computer Enhancement Fund provided by Section 265 of this title, shall be apportioned as fo llows: 1. Except as provided in subsections C and D of this section, the following amounts shall be paid to the State Treasurer to be ENGR. S. B. NO. 1262 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 placed to the credit of the General Revenue Fund to be paid out pursuant to direct appropriation by the Legislature: Fiscal Year Amount FY 2003 and FY 2004 86.04% FY 2005 85.83% FY 2006 85.54% FY 2007 85.04% FY 2008 through FY 2022 83.61% FY 2023 through FY 2027 83.36% FY 2028 and each fiscal year thereafter 83.61%; 2. The following amounts shall be paid to the State Treasu rer to be placed to the credit of the Education Reform Revolving Fund of the State Department of Education: a. for FY 2003, FY 2004 and FY 2005, ten and forty -two one-hundredths percent (10.42%), b. for FY 2006 through FY 2020, ten and forty -six one- hundredths percent (10.46% ), c. for FY 2021: (1) for the month beginning July 1, 2020, through the month ending August 31, 2020, ten and forty-six one-hundredths percent (10.46%), and (2) for the month beginning September 1, 2020, through the month ending June 3 0, 2021, eleven ENGR. S. B. NO. 1262 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 and ninety-six one-hundredths percent (11.96%), and d. for FY 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter, ten and forty-six one-hundredths percent (10.46%); 3. The following amounts shall be paid to the Sta te Treasurer to be placed to the credit of the Teachers' Retirement System Dedicated Revenue Revolving Fund: Fiscal Year Amount FY 2003 and FY 2004 3.54% FY 2005 3.75% FY 2006 4.0% FY 2007 4.5% FY 2008 through FY 2020 5.0% FY 2021: a. for the month beginni ng July 1, 2020, through the month ending August 31, 2020 5.0% b. for the month beginning September 1, 2020, through the month ending June 30, 2021 3.5% FY 2022 5.0% FY 2023 through FY 2027 5.25% FY 2028 and each fiscal year thereafter 5.0%; ENGR. S. B. NO. 1262 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 4. a. except as otherwise provided in subparagraph b of this paragraph, for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2015, and for each fiscal year thereafter, eighty-seven one- hundredths percent (0.87%) shall be paid to the State Treasurer to be further apportioned as follows: (1) thirty-six percent (36%) shall be placed to the credit of the Oklahoma Tourism Promotion Revolving Fund, but in no event shall such apportionment exceed Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000.00) in any fiscal year the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2022, and previous fiscal years, Six Million Dollars ($6,000,000.00) in the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2023, Six Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ( $6,500,000.00) in the fiscal year beginning July 1, 202 4, and Seven Million Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ($7,500,000.00) in the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2025, and subsequent fiscal years, and (2) sixty-four percent (64%) shall be placed to the credit of the Oklahoma Tourism Capital Improvement Revolving Fund, but in no event shall such apportionment exceed Nine Million Dollars ($9,000,000.00) in any fiscal year, and ENGR. S. B. NO. 1262 Page 5 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 b. any amounts which exceed the limitations of subparagraph a of this paragraph shall be placed to the credit of the General Rev enue Fund; and 5. For the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2015, and for each fiscal year thereafter, six o ne-hundredths percent (0.0 6%) shall be placed to the credit of the Oklahoma Histo rical Society Capital Improvement and Operations Revolving Fund, but in no event shall such apportionment exceed the total amount apportioned pursuant to this paragraph for th e fiscal year ending on Ju ne 30, 2015. Any amounts which exceed the limitations of this paragraph shall be placed to the credit of the General Revenu e Fund. B. Provided, for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2007, and every fiscal year thereafter, an amo unt of revenue shall be apportioned to each municipality or county which levies a sales tax subject to the provisions of Section 1357.10 of this titl e and subsection F of Section 2701 of this title equal to the amou nt of sales tax revenue of such municipal ity or county exempted by the provisions of Section 1357.10 of this title and sub section F of Section 2701 of this title. The Oklahoma Tax Commissio n shall promulgate and adopt rules necessary to implement the prov isions of this subsection. C. From the monies that would otherwise be apportioned to the General Revenue Fund pursuant to subsection A of this section, there shall be apportioned the follo wing amounts: ENGR. S. B. NO. 1262 Page 6 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 1. For the month ending August 31, 2019: a. Nine Million Six Hundred Thousand Dollars ($9,600,000.00) to the credit of the State Highway Construction and Maintenance Fund cre ated in Section 1501 of Title 69 of the Oklahoma Statutes, and b. Two Million Dollars ($2,000,000.00) to the credit of the Oklahoma Railroad Maintenance Revolving Fund created in Section 309 of Title 6 6 of the Oklahoma Statutes; 2. For the month ending Se ptember 30, 2019: a. Twenty Million Dollars ($20,000,000.00) t o the credit of the State Highway Construction and Maintenance Fund created in Section 1501 of Title 69 of the Ok lahoma Statutes, and b. Two Million Dollars ($2,000,000.00) to the credit of the Oklahoma Railroad Maintenance Revolving Fund created in Section 309 of Title 66 of the Oklahoma Statutes; 3. For the month ending Oct ober 31, 2019: a. Twenty Million Dollars ($20,000,000.00) to the cr edit of the State Highway Construction and Maintenance Fund created in Section 1501 of Title 69 of the Oklahoma Statutes, and ENGR. S. B. NO. 1262 Page 7 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 b. Two Million Dollars ($2,000,000.00) to the credit of the Oklahoma Railroad Maintenance Revolving Fund created in Section 309 of Title 66 of the Oklahoma Statutes; 4. For the month ending November 30, 2019: a. Twenty Million Dollars ($20,000,000.00) to the credi t of the State Highway Construction and Maintenance Fu nd created in Section 1501 of Title 69 of the Oklahoma Statutes, and b. Two Million Dollars ($2,000,000.00) to the credit of the Oklahoma Railroad Maintenance Revolving Fund created in Section 309 of Ti tle 66 of the Oklahoma Statutes; and 5. For the month ending December 31, 2019: a. Twenty Million Dollars ($20,000,000.0 0) to the credit of the State Highway Construction and Maintenance Fund created in Section 1501 of Title 69 of the Oklahoma Statutes, and b. Two Million Dollars ($2,000,000.00) to the credi t of the Oklahoma Railroad Maintenance Re volving Fund created in Section 309 of Title 66 of the Oklahoma Statutes. D. For fiscal year 2023, and each subsequent fiscal year, before any other apportionment otherwise required by this section is ENGR. S. B. NO. 1262 Page 8 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 made to the General Revenue Fund, there shall be appor tioned to the State Public Common School Building Equalization Fund an amount, if any, as required pursuant to Section 3-104 of Title 70 of the Oklahoma Statutes, not to exceed the state sales tax generated by medical marijuana sales in the preceding fisca l year as reported by the Oklahoma Tax Commission. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2022. Passed the Senate the 21st day of March, 2022. Presiding Officer of the Senate Passed the House of Representatives the ____ day of __________, 2022. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives