House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Stinson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Floyd |