Senate | 04/25/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Howard |