Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1277 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022