House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 17 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Stinson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Stanley |