Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1298 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022