Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB13 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021