Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|