Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1324 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022