Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 10
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Remove as author Senator McCortney; authored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|