Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1371 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022